Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Armendariz, Steve Jael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hernandez, Manuel H., against Acosta, Joe, Mad Diaz Trucking, Llc, represented by House, John Howell, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 161st District Court with Low, Justin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2023 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident > $250K |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House161st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served - by Private Process Server ON 09/29/2023 AT 7:45 PM |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served - by Private Process Server ON 09/29/2023 AT 8:08 PM |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) POP and Jury Demand |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation E-MAILED TO MHERNANDEZ@FCHCLAW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.