Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Olsen-Zhang, Jessica Kim, against Orozco, Arturo, represented by Schafer, Daniel M., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 161st District Court with Low, Justin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLow, Justin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract < $250K |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House161st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-SUIT |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING SET FOR: FEBRUARY 2ND, 2023 AT 9:00 AM |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request FOR A NON-JURY TRIAL |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Plaintiffs Notice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served - by Private Process Server ON 9/8/2021 AT 7:56PM |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation E-MAILED TO RSIEHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.