Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Garcia, Adam, represented by Brown, Bj, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 161st District Court with Low, Justin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2018 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House161st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Warrant Returned - Unserved (Non-OCA) RECALLED |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Failure to Appear FOR JURY TRIAL ON 7/19/21. |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Warrant Recalled (GOB Warrant Replaced with FTA Warrant) | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note State announced ready defendant failed to appear name called x3 at courthouse door no answer, bond forfeited and capias issued. JWL |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR: 7/19/21 @ 8:45 AM. CC TO D.A & B.BROWN BY L.N. |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO ISSUE WARRANT E-MAILED TO ASA BONDING 07/15/2021 BY L.P |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | STATE'S WITNESS LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.