Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) case against Reyes, Angelica, represented by Chastain, Marc, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts with John Wayne Smith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Wayne Smith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2017 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note Order of Dismissal. /s/ John W. Smith |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL E-MAILED TO MARC CHASTAIN AND ASA BONDING ON 5/18/18 BY L.U. |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note 2/5/18 State ready at arraignment; Waiver of Arraignment. /s/ James Rex |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Indictment ABANDON ENDANGER CHILD W/INTENT TO RETURN (SJF) |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | New Criminal Case Filed (OCA) | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
BOND FILED POSTED AT JAIL 11/28/2017; ASA BONDING; $25,000.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.