Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
District Attorney filed a(n) case against Wagoner, Glen Allen, represented by Schoel, Jason, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts with John Wayne Smith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Wayne Smith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT OF CS OFFICER - SUCCESSFUL COMPLETION STD PROBATION | |
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED RULES OF PROBATION | |
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED RULES OF PROBATION | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED RULES OF PROBATION | |
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Trial Date | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURT'S CERTIFICATE | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF DISCOVERY (Plea) | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS (Plea) | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING COMMUNITY SUPERVISION | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF APPEAL (Plea) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.