Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Martinez, Ruben, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lopez, Julian T., against Mendez Manriquez, Saul, represented by Grossman, Leonard R., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2023 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident > $250K |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Defendant's Motion for Leave to Designate Responsible Third Party |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Designating Responsible Third Party(ies) | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING SET FOR: NOVEMBER 27, 2023 AT 2:00 P.M. |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE THIRD PARTY |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE THIRD PARTY |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE THIRD PARTY |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served - by Private Process Server DUPLICATE |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served - by Private Process Server ON 10/05/2023 AT 9:41 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.