Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Lujan, Juan Carlos, represented by Garcia, Bob, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER OF COMMITMENT HAND DELIVERED TO D.A., CALLED B. GARCIA LEFT MESSAGE WILL PLACE IN ATTORNEYS BOX, WILL ALSO EMAIL B. GARCIA AND INTER OFFICE CERTIFIED COPY TO LT. MOLINAR ON 11/16/21 BY B.L. |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR PSYCHIATRIC EXAMINATION SENT TO D.A; ROBERT GARCIA, JAIL AND DR. STROBEL ON 09/28/2021 BY R.B |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR COMPETENCY EXAMINATION |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ Of Habeas Corpus | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ Of Habeas Corpus | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PRECEPT RETURNED SERVED | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO B GARCIA ON 09/01/2021 BY M.M. |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON09/01/2021 BY S.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.