Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Casarez, Pedro M, represented by Halsell, Glen G, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Guilty Plea Hearing | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Waiver of Right to a Jury Trial EMAILED TO G. HALSELL, DA APO AND JAIL 12/03/2021 BY L.P |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GUILTY PLEA DATE SET FOR:12/07/2021 @ 2:00PM. EMAILED TO G. HALSELL, DA, APO, AND JAIL ON 12/02/2021 BY MS |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRO-SE MOTION TO DISMISS COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL AND APPOINT NEW EMAILED TO G. HALSELL AND DA ON 10/26/2021 BY HR |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Capias Returned - Served (OCA) | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO G. HALSELL ON 09/08/2021 BY HR |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PRECEPT RETURNED SERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.