Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Herrera, Adrian, represented by Thomas, Matt L., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Guilty Plea Hearing | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GUILTY PLEA DATE SCHEDULED JANUARY 19, 2021 @ 10:00 AM. COPY TO M. THOMAS, DA APO AND JAIL BY MS |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PRECEPT RETURNED SERVED | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON09/01/2021 BY S.C. |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Precept to Serve | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Indictment THEFT PROP <$2,500 2/MORE PREV CONV 31.03 SJF |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING BOND WITH SPECIAL CONDITIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.