Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Covey, Mindy Cherie, represented by Chavez, Tony, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO ISSUE WARRANT EMAILED TO CHAVEZ LAW FIRM AND DA ON 10/02/2021 BY HR |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Warrant Issued-GOB (OCA) | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR BONDING CO. TO GO OFF BOND FILED BY T. CHAVEZ |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER RECALLING WARRANT WARRANT ID # L-3250-B; SENT TO DISPATCH, WARRANT DIVISION, DA AND CHAVEZ LAW FIRM ON 9/9/21 BY JT. |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON09/01/2021 BY S.C. |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO T CHAVEZ ON 08/27/2021 |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | New Criminal Case Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.