Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Goode, Charles Lee, filed a(n) Partnership < $250K case represented by Stroder, Allen, against Randolph, Donna, Randolph, Mark Caleb, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2017 |
CategoryPartnership < $250K |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
|
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW | |
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing by submission |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (does not close out case) WITHOUT PREJUDICE ONLY AS TO COUNTER-PLAINTIFF REBECCA RANDOLPH'S CLAIMS |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING BY SUBMISSION ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW SET FOR:APRIL 23, 2020 AT 9:30 AM |
|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE ONLY AS TO COUNTER-PLAINTIFF RECECCA RANDOLPH'S CLAIMS |
|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Counterclaim DEFENDANTS' FIRST AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. COUNTERCLAIM AND JURY DEMAND |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.