Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Conn Appliances, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jaramillo, Roberto, Millard, Marshall Neill, Olsen-Zhang, Jessica Kim, against Hernandez, Arnold, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2017 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract > $250K |
Last RefreshedJanuary 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Plaintiff's Request for an Appointment of a Receiver. |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING SET FOR: JANUARY 4, 2023 AT 10:00 AM |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR POST-JUDGMENT RECEIVERSHIP (CPRC Sec. 31.002) | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR POST-JUDGMENT RECEIVERSHIP (CPRC Sec. 31.002) | |
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT MAILED TO DEFENDANT | |
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (OCA) | |
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served CITATION RETURN BY AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.