Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
O'Hearon, Bryon Lewis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Tefteller, Andy, Tefteller, Jarom, Tefteller, Todd, against Hunt Contractors, Ltd, Jjh Interests, Inc., Melendez, Cruz, Melendez, Cruz, Jr., Melendez, Kristyna, (total of 11) See All represented by Cano, Brian Gregory, Darville, Ross Aaron, Grossman, Leonard Raymond, Hendrick, B. Calvin, Mimari, Nik A., (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident > $250K |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO COURT FROM MEDIATOR JAMES J. JUNEAU |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Defendants Motion to Compel Expert Trial Deposition or the Alternative and Motion for Continuance |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING AMENDED SET FOR: JULY F28, 2022 ON MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion For Continuance | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Letter to Ector County District Clerk RE: Change of Email Address for Jarom Tefteller and Betty Rutherford |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING SET FOR: JULY 20, 2022 AT 3:00 PM |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL EXPERT TRIAL DEPOSITIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.