Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Denzer, John Allen, represented by Abalos, Feliz, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 358th District Court with Shrode, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShrode, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House358th District Court |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Revocation Hearing | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note Def pled to 5 TDCJ |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ATTACHMENT - FINGERPRINT PAGE | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF APPEAL (Plea) | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURT'S CERTIFICATE | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
AGREEMENT OF JAIL TIME CREDIT 231 DAYS |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Revocation Hearing | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING REVOCATION HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 1/12/21 @ 1:30 PM CC TO F. ABALOS, D.A, APO, AND JAIL BY S.C. |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Warrant Returned (Adjudication) - Served (OCA) | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED MOTION FOR WARRANT AND TO ADJUDICATE GUILT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.