Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Complex Community Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bebout, Shane M, against Alexander, Matthew Michael, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 244th District Court with Rush, James presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRush, James Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2020 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Consumer/Dtpa < $250K |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House244th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Motion to Compel and Motion for Turnover Order |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING SET FOR: JANUARY 6, 2021 AT 10:00 AM |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR TURNOVER ORDER |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Cost Bill EMAILED TO ATTORNEY |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COST BILL E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Invoice for Indirect Court Costs $75.00 FOR PROCESS SERVER FEES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.