Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ruiz, Charlie Azmed, represented by Chavez, Luis A., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 161st District Court with Smith, John W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, John W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House161st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT EMAILED TO CC; CHAVEZ LAW FIRM ON 11/19/20 BY L.T. |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order For Court Appointed Attorney (Criminal) CC; L. CHAVEZ, D.A. AND JAIL ON 11/19/20 BY L.T. |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | PRECEPT RETURNED SERVED | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Capias Returned - Served (OCA) | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER RECALLING WARRANT SENT TO DISPATCH, WARRANT DIVISION AND D.A., ON 02/14/20 BY L.T. |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Precept to Serve | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Indictment UNAUTHORIZED USE OF VEHICLE 31.07 STATE JAIL FELONY |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | New Criminal Case Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.