Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Munoz, Francisco Antonio, represented by Haygood, Lane Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE EMAILED TO L. HAYGOOD, DA, AND ASA BONDING CO. ON 12/02/2021 BY HR |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO L.HAYGOOD ON 9/14/21 BY D.L. |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter of Representation | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON09/01/2021 BY S.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.