Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bernal, Jacob Alan, represented by Leach, Jason, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Article 39.14 Letter | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON09/01/2021 BY S.C. |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO J LEACH AND ASA BONDING ON 08/27/2021 BY MM |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Indictment POSS CS PG 1<1G 481.115 SJF |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
BOND FILED POSTED AT JAIL ON 05212021; ASA BONDING $10,000 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.