Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Guitan, Iris Nicole, represented by Garcia, Robert V, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Guilty Plea Hearing | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GUILTY PLEA DATE SET FOR:01/19/2022 @ 11:00 AM NOTICE SENT BY COURT |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Waiver of Right to a Jury Trial EMAILED TO R. GARCIA, D.A. AND APO ON 12/15/2021 BY M.M. |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON 09/01/2021 BY S.C. |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO R GARCIA ON 08272021 BY MM |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
BOND FILED POSTED AT JAIL ON 07062021; ROBERT GARCIA $7,500 |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Indictment ABANDON ENDANGER CHILD W/INTENT TO RETURN 22.041 SJF |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING BOND WITH SPECIAL CONDITIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.