Case Last Refreshed: 9 hours ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Francis, Gregory Edwards, represented by Mansur, D. Bret, Wildman, Phillip, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURT'S CERTIFICATE | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Payment of Court Appointed Attorney $1,000 TO PHILLIP WILDMAN FOR CASES C-22-0844-CR AND A-21-1217-CR, EMAILED TO P. WILDMAN AND AUDITOR ON 04/13/2023 BY AM |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS (Plea) | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF APPEAL (Plea) | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | WRITTEN ADMONISHMENT - INELIGIBLE TO POSSESS FIREARM/AMMO | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note D sentenced per plea agreement |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF DISCOVERY (Plea) | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION E- MAILED TO P. WILDMAN AND D.A ON 04/13/2023 BY M.I. |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREEMENT OF JAIL TIME CREDIT 475 DAYS |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Waiver of Right to a Jury Trial ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR CASES C-22-0844-CR AND A-21-1217-CR SET ON APRIL 13, 2023 @ 9:30AM, EMAILED TO P. WILDMAN, DA, APO, PSM AND JAIL ON 03/30/2023 BY AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.