Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vleet, Victoria Van, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Cargile, Jason Wyatt, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 362nd Judicial District Court with White, David Converted Disposition:Party: CARGILE, JASON WYATT Disposition: FINAL-NON-JURY Judgment : Other Party(Cargile, Jason WyattJudgment: (O - Other AGREED ORDER ESTABLISHING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP FINAL-NON-JURY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 1996 |
CategoryOther Family |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court House362nd Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 1997 | Docket Event |
Returned and filed green card for certified mail sent to: ANDERSON WRECKER; SIGNED 09/04/97 RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) ANDERSON WRECKER; SIGNED 09/04/97 RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) |
|
August 26, 1997 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Cert. of Notice to Employer of Order Withholding ANDERSON WRECKER SERVICE; 2701 W 15TH ST; PLANO, TX 75075 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE TO EMPLOYER OF ORDER WITHHOLDING (CCOWE) ANDERSON WRECKER SERVICE; 2701 W 15TH ST; PLANO, TX 75075 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE TO EMPLOYER OF ORDER WITHHOLDING (CCOWE) |
|
February 25, 1997 | Docket Event |
Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) |
|
February 20, 1997 | Docket Event |
ORDER WITHHOLDING FROM EARNINGS FOR CHILD SUPPORT (OWI) Order Withholding From Earnings for Child Support ORDER WITHHOLDING FROM EARNINGS FOR CHILD SUPPORT (OWI) |
|
December 18, 1996 | Docket Event |
Citation Name: CARGILE, JASON WYATT 96-40863-362 IN THE INTEREST OF MICHAEL AUSTIN CARGILE A MINOR CHILD Type: CIT County: Denton Authority: District Clerk Status: S,N Return: District Clerk CARGILE, JASON WYATT Served 01/09/1997 Response Due 02/03/1997 Serving Method Certified Mail Name: CARGILE, JASON WYATT 96-40863-362 IN THE INTEREST OF MICHAEL AUSTIN CARGILE A MINOR CHILD Type: CIT County: Denton Authority: District Clerk Status: S,N Return: District Clerk |
|
December 18, 1996 | Docket Event |
Filed document Service Event (Citation) Name: CARGILE, JASON WYATT Service Event (Citation) Name: CARGILE, JASON WYATT |
|
December 18, 1996 | Docket Event |
Opening Filing Event Case Filing Atty General Number: 4228452231 Case Filing Atty General Number: 4228452231 |
|
December 18, 1996 | Docket Event |
Original Petition to Establish Paternity (PATY) PETITION TO ESTABLISH THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP (PEPCR) PETITION TO ESTABLISH THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP (PEPCR) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.