Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Providence Village Homeowners Association, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adam Pugh, against Marshall, Jennifer, Marshall, Doug, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 431st Judicial District Court with Bailey, Jonathan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryContract: Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House431st Judicial District Court |
Request for Issuance of
Date: March 09, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Bookkeeping Notes Issued ck 2571 to Slater Pugh Ltd. LLP (re: Real Property sale) Issued ck 2571 to Slater Pugh Ltd. LLP (re: Real Property sale) |
|
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Bailey, Jonathan ) to Release Funds to Release Funds |
|
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Order Of Sale Order Of Sale |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Placed in Sheriff's box for pick up Requested By Providence Village Homeowners Association, Inc. Marshall, Jennifer Served 06/03/2014 10:00 AM Anticipated Server Sheriff Anticipated Method Personal Returned 06/04/2014 Serving Officer Royea, Jon Placed in Sheriff's box for pick up |
|
March 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Order of Sale Made by: Providence Village Homeowners Association, Inc. Order of Sale |
|
February 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Marshall, Doug Party: Marshall, Jennifer Party: Marshall, DougParty: Marshall, Jennifer |
|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Bailey, Jonathan ) Final Judgment for Parties: Marshall, Doug for Parties: Marshall, Jennifer for Parties: Providence Village Homeowners Association, Inc. Final Judgment |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Party: Providence Village Homeowners Association, Inc. Party: Providence Village Homeowners Association, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.