Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Boyd, Sally, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lawrence F. Rolle, against Frank Bartel Tire, Inc., Thomas, Bobby, represented by D Randall Montgomery, Michael K. Justus, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 367th Judicial District Court with Barnes, Margaret presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryInjury/Damages - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House367th Judicial District Court |
Proposed Order - printed for submission to the Court by:
Date: March 23, 2015Defendant's Original Answer
Date: July 31, 2014Request for Issuance of
Date: May 28, 2014Request for
Date: April 07, 2014Defendant's Original Answer
Date: April 07, 2014Request for Issuance of
Date: February 21, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Barnes, Margaret E. ) Agreed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice for Parties: Boyd, Sally for Parties: Frank Bartel Tire, Inc. for Parties: Thomas, Bobby Agreed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - printed for submission to the Court by: Court Coordinator Court Coordinator |
|
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Reporter's/Officer's Cert. of Deposition: Deposition of Sally Ann Boyd Party: Thomas, Bobby Sally Ann Boyd |
|
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Party: Frank Bartel Tire, Inc. Party: Frank Bartel Tire, Inc. |
|
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation Party: Frank Bartel Tire, Inc. Citation |
|
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Medical Records Affidavit(s) (Denton Regional Medical Center) Filed by: Boyd, Sally (Denton Regional Medical Center) |
|
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit(s) of Medical Records (Denton Regional Medical Center) of Medical Records (Denton Regional Medical Center) |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Concerning Costs and Necessity of Services (Patient Place) Party: Boyd, Sally (Patient Place) |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit(s) Medical Records (Dr. Jason Astrin) Filed by: Boyd, Sally Medical Records (Dr. Jason Astrin) |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit(s) Medical Records (Dr. David Cooke) Filed by: Boyd, Sally Medical Records (Dr. David Cooke) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.