Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Assessed Costs filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kellow, Cindy Sue, Kellow, Patrick Scott, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 158th Judicial District Court with Burgess, Steve presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House158th Judicial District Court |
Record/Copy Request
Date: November 14, 2018Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: December 08, 2016Request for Issuance of
Date: April 29, 2015Billing Statement
Date: December 08, 2016Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: December 08, 2016Proposed Order - printed for submission to the Court by:
Date: January 29, 2015Request for Issuance of
Date: January 31, 2014Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: June 05, 2014Counter Petition/Claim
Date: March 04, 2014Respondent's Original Answer
Date: March 04, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Conine, Casey ) Child Support Review Order (Modification) for Parties: Kellow, Cindy Sue for Parties: Kellow, Patrick Scott Child Support Review Order (Modification) |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Billing Statement Sent to: Kellow, Patrick Scott Sent to: Kellow, Patrick Scott |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Kellow, Cindy Sue Party: Kellow, Patrick Scott Party: Kellow, Cindy SueParty: Kellow, Patrick Scott |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Due Party: Kellow, Patrick Scott Party: Kellow, Patrick Scott |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judicial Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Conine, Casey ) Signed Child Support Review Order Signed Child Support Review Order |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
CSRP-Reduce Judg/Mod/ Enf/Consolidate/Lien/Correct (RPMO) Child Support Review Order (Modification) Filed by:: Office Of The Attorney General, Child Support Division Child Support Review Order (Modification) |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Email/Fax Correspondence Forwarded to Judge's queue. CN Forwarded to Judge's queue. CN |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.