Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Denton Independent School District, The City Of Denton, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Gilbert T. Bragg, Matthew Tepper, Gregory J. Sawko, Mark A Burroughs, against Holbert, Mary Ann, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 362nd Judicial District Court with McFarling, Bruce presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House362nd Judicial District Court |
Petition/Plea of Intervention
Date: September 24, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Billing Statement $546.00 Sent to: Holbert, Mary Ann | |
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Bill of Cost Sent to defendant Sent to defendant |
|
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Holbert, Mary Ann Party: Holbert, Mary Ann |
|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: McFarling, Bruce ) Judgment for Parties: Denton Independent School District for Parties: Holbert, Mary Ann for Parties: The City Of Denton for Parties: The County Of Denton, Texas Judgment |
|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McFarling, Bruce) Set by Mark Burroughs office by phone on 6-11-2014 @ 3:44 Set by Mark Burroughs office by phone on 6-11-2014 @ 3:44 |
|
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address Party: Holbert, Mary Ann Party: Holbert, Mary Ann |
|
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Members Civil Relief Act Affidavit Party: Holbert, Mary Ann Party: Holbert, Mary Ann |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certified Tax Affidavit On behalf of: Denton Independent School District On behalf of: The City Of Denton On behalf of: Denton Independent School DistrictOn behalf of: The City Of Denton |
|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition/Plea of Intervention Party: The County Of Denton, Texas Party: The County Of Denton, Texas |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.