Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dedman, James Warren, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dedman, Heather Miller, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 16th Judicial District Court with Shipman, Sherry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce Without Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House16th Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Agreed Final Decree of Divorce for Parties: Dedman, Heather Miller for Parties: Dedman, James Warren Agreed Final Decree of Divorce |
|
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note No child support ordered No child support ordered |
|
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Final Decree sent to Party: Dedman, Heather Miller Party: Dedman, Heather Miller |
|
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judicial Docket Entry 03.06.2014-Entered Final Decree of Divorce based on husband's testimony. DMR 03.06.2014-Entered Final Decree of Divorce based on husband's testimony. DMR |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service or Citation Party: Dedman, Heather Miller Party: Dedman, Heather Miller |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Original Petition for Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.