Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rapp, Susan J., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Grace Ann Weatherly, against Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc. Maxim Healthcare Services, Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.  Maxim Healthcare Services, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 431st Judicial District Court with Bailey, Jonathan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryContract: Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House431st Judicial District Court |
Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: December 31, 2012Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: January 29, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Judge, Not Required ) Defendant Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.'s Notice of Filing Notice of Removal for Parties: Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc. for Parties: Rapp, Susan J. Defendant Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.'s Notice of Filing Notice of Removal |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition Application for Injunctive Relief, and Request for Disclosure Application for Injunctive Relief, and Request for Disclosure |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Citation gave to courier Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc. Served 01/07/2013 Returned 01/09/2013 gave to courier |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.