Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kirkpatrick, Jared Scott, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kirkpatrick, Natalya Victoria, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 431st Judicial District Court with Bailey, Jonathan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House431st Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: (sent copy of order) Party: Mueller, Paulette Party: Sorrels, Wayne (sent copy of order) |
|
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Bailey, Jonathan ) Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution for Parties: Kirkpatrick, Jared Scott for Parties: Kirkpatrick, Natalya Victoria Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution |
|
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Courts Dismissal Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bailey, Jonathan) LE: 2/14/13; Pet & Counter LE: 2/14/13; Pet & Counter |
|
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting Mailed to: Sorrels, Wayne Mailed to: Sorrels, Wayne |
|
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting Mailed to: Mueller, Paulette Mailed to: Mueller, Paulette |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer(s) and/or Response(s) and Counterpetition for Divorce Party: Kirkpatrick, Natalya Victoria and Counterpetition for Divorce |
|
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Citation put in constable's box Kirkpatrick, Natalya Victoria Served 01/29/2013 8:19 AM Anticipated Server Constable #2 Anticipated Method Personal Actual Server Constable - Pct. 2 Returned 01/31/2013 2:10 PM Serving Officer House, William K Serving Method Personal Delivery put in constable's box |
|
January 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
First Amended (Original) Petition for Divorce Party: Kirkpatrick, Jared Scott for Divorce |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Original Petition for Divorce (Notice of Hearing returned not signed with a note stating, "Attorney needs to call to set a Hearing") (Notice of Hearing returned not signed with a note stating, "Attorney needs to call to set a Hearing") |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.