Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mendoza, Belinda, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rayshun Jackson, against Adams, Roger, Logsdon, Phyllis, represented by B. Blake Cox, Jennifer M. Covington, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 431st Judicial District Court with Bailey, Jonathan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryDebt/Contract: Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House431st Judicial District Court |
Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: December 27, 2012Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: October 14, 2013Application for Subpoena(s) and Subpoena(s) issued to
Date: April 08, 2013Agreed Motion
Date: October 09, 2013Defendant's Original Answer
Date: January 28, 2013Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: October 11, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Cox, B. Blake Party: Jackson, Rayshun Party: Cox, B. BlakeParty: Jackson, Rayshun |
|
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Bailey, Jonathan ) Agreed Order for Dismissal with Prejudice for Parties: Cox, B. Blake for Parties: Jackson, Rayshun Agreed Order for Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice (order sent to court) for Dismissal With Prejudice (order sent to court) |
|
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit(s) With Attached Business Records With Attached Business Records |
|
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Application for Subpoena(s) and Subpoena(s) issued to On behalf of: Mendoza, Belinda On behalf of: Mendoza, Belinda |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Party: Adams, Roger Party: Logsdon, Phyllis Party: Adams, RogerParty: Logsdon, Phyllis |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Citation mailed to Attorney Adams, Roger Unserved Anticipated Server Private Process Server Anticipated Method Personal Logsdon, Phyllis Unserved Anticipated Server Private Process Server Anticipated Method Personal mailed to Attorney |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Jury fee paid (This entry only represents the payment of the jury fee - not a document filed with the clerk.) (This entry only represents the payment of the jury fee - not a document filed with the clerk.) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.