Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garrison, Jackie, Garrison, Robert, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Brent R. Walker, Charla Aldous, against Bergstrom, Jon, M.D., Corinth Investor Holdings, L.L.C., Imaging Consultants Of Denton, P.A., Khan, Jalil A., M.D., Khan Md, Pa, Jalil A., (total of 5) See All represented by Cathy F. Bailey, David Michael Walsh, Iv, Laura Salinas, Nelson Skyler, Tarush R Anand, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 431st Judicial District Court with Bailey, Jonathan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryMalpractice - Medical |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court House431st Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Courts Dismissal Hearing Case has been disposed CANCELED Courts Dismissal Hearing (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Bailey, Jonathan) Case has been disposed set by Ct. Administrator on 4/29/14 |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit with Prejudice Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit with Prejudice |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Aldous, Charla Party: Anand, Tarush R Party: Bailey, Cathy F. Party: Chamblee, William H. Party: Aldous, CharlaParty: Anand, Tarush RParty: Bailey, Cathy F.Party: Chamblee, William H. |
|
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Announced Settled - Disposition order required in 30 days CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bailey, Jonathan) Announced Settled - Disposition order required in 30 days |
|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing Announced Settled - Disposition order required in 30 days CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bailey, Jonathan) Announced Settled - Disposition order required in 30 days and Motion for Enforcement of Settlement Agreement reset by Ct on 4/24/14 |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response(s) to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement Against J.Khan, MD and for Attorneys' Fees Party: Khan MD, PA, Jalil A. Party: Khan, Jalil A., M.D. to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement Against J.Khan, MD and for Attorneys' Fees |
|
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Letter (or email) regarding setting/hearing/trial from Denise Spalding to Counsel from Denise Spalding to Counsel |
|
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (Correction) (Correction) |
|
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement Against Jalil Khan, M.D. and for Attorneys' Fees Party: Garrison, Jackie Party: Garrison, Robert to Enforce Settlement Agreement Against Jalil Khan, M.D. and for Attorneys' Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.