Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sehnert, Patricia Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sehnert, Phillip Fredrick, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Robison, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce Without Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Judges' Docket Notes from Case File | |
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Order Granting Nonsuit Of Application for Protective Order for Parties: Sehnert, Patricia Ann for Parties: Sehnert, Phillip Fredrick Order Granting Nonsuit Of Application for Protective Order |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit Of Application For Protective Order Party: Sehnert, Patricia Ann Of Application For Protective Order |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (partial case closing) (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Order Granting Nonsuit for Parties: Sehnert, Patricia Ann for Parties: Sehnert, Phillip Fredrick Order Granting Nonsuit |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit Party: Sehnert, Patricia Ann Party: Sehnert, Phillip Fredrick Party: Sehnert, Patricia AnnParty: Sehnert, Phillip Fredrick |
|
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Hearing Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time CANCELED Temporary Restraining Order Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Douglas) Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time |
|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter (or email) regarding setting/hearing/trial to Court Coordinator Party: Rosso, Gerad T. to Court Coordinator |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) to Extend Temporary Restraining Order to Extend Temporary Restraining Order |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order box E-28 Sehnert, Phillip Fredrick Unserved box E-28 |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Party: Sehnert, Patricia Ann to Extend Temporary Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.