Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Faheem, Wael Fatin, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gharib, Sawsan, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Robison, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Request for Issuance of
Date: September 26, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Deputy Reporter Statement | |
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Call For Ms. Sawsan Gharib For Ms. Sawsan Gharib |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: GHARIB, SAWSAN Party: GHARIB, SAWSAN |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Douglas) (ASO entered on 10-2-14) 1 HOUR (ASO entered on 10-2-14) 1 HOUR |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Final Decree of Divorce for Parties: Faheem, Wael Fatin for Parties: GHARIB, SAWSAN Final Decree of Divorce |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judicial Docket Entry 11.25.2014-Entered Final Decree of Divorce based on husband's uncontradicted testimony. Ordered that copy of Final Decree of Divorce be sent to wife at last known address by certified mail, regular mail and be e-mail, e-mail address given by husband on record. DMR 11.25.2014-Entered Final Decree of Divorce based on husband's uncontradicted testimony. Ordered that copy of Final Decree of Divorce be sent to wife at last known address by certified mail, regular mail and be e-mail, e-mail address given by husband on record. DMR |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judicial Docket Entry 11.25.2014-Continued hearing due to need to appoint counsel for mother; mother found to be indigent based on affidavit filed and her receiving food stamps; appointed Ervette Sims to be her counsel. DMR 11.25.2014-Continued hearing due to need to appoint counsel for mother; mother found to be indigent based on affidavit filed and her receiving food stamps; appointed Ervette Sims to be her counsel. DMR |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation (Sawsan Gharib) Party: Faheem, Wael Fatin Citation (Sawsan Gharib) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.