Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Assessed Costs filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Roehr, Michael Larson, Roehr, Bonnie Kay, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Robison, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Billing Statement Sent to: Roehr, Michael Larson Sent to: Roehr, Michael Larson |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Roehr, Bonnie Kay Party: Roehr, Michael Larson Party: Roehr, Bonnie KayParty: Roehr, Michael Larson |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Due Party: Roehr, Michael Larson Party: Roehr, Michael Larson |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Jenkins, Cherami Joann ) Child Support Review Order (Confirmation of Arrears and Modification) for Parties: Office Of The Attorney General, Child Support Division for Parties: Roehr, Bonnie Kay for Parties: Roehr, Michael Larson Child Support Review Order (Confirmation of Arrears and Modification) |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
CSRP Enforce/Modify or Confirm Arrears/Modify (RPMM) Child Support Review Order (Confirmation of Arrears and Modification) Filed by:: Office Of The Attorney General, Child Support Division Child Support Review Order (Confirmation of Arrears and Modification) |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Signature Confirmation Page for Certified Mailer American Airlines American Airlines |
|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Cert. of Notice to Employer of Order Withholding American Airlines American Airlines |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Cert. of Notice to Employer of Order Withholding (Ntelicor; delivered 9.8.15 to J. Nelson) (Ntelicor; delivered 9.8.15 to J. Nelson) |
|
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.