Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Assessed Costs filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Lopez, Zeferino, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 362nd Judicial District Court with Bailey, Jonathan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryCriminal Related |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Filing Court House362nd Judicial District Court |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (partial case closing)
Date: January 29, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Lopez, Zeferino Party: Lopez, Zeferino |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Party: The State of Texas Party: The State of Texas |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Shipman, L. Dee ) Final Default Judgment of Forfeiture for Parties: Lopez, Zeferino for Parties: The State of Texas Final Default Judgment of Forfeiture |
|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Andrade, Rodrigo Party: Arteaga, Michelle Marie Party: Flores-Diaz, Armando Party: Garcia, Gerardo Party: Lopez, Zeferino Party: Stacey, Sheila Party: Andrade, RodrigoParty: Arteaga, Michelle MarieParty: Flores-Diaz, ArmandoParty: Garcia, GerardoParty: Lopez, ZeferinoParty: Stacey, Sheila |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (partial case closing) (Judicial Officer: Burgess, Steve ) Default Judgment for Parties: Andrade, Rodrigo for Parties: Arteaga, Michelle Marie for Parties: Flores-Diaz, Armando for Parties: Garcia, Gerardo for Parties: Stacey, Sheila for Parties: The State of Texas Default Judgment |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address Party: Garcia, Gerardo Party: Garcia, Gerardo |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address Party: Stacey, Sheila Party: Stacey, Sheila |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address Party: Andrade, Rodrigo Party: Arteaga, Michelle Marie Party: Flores-Diaz, Armando Party: Andrade, RodrigoParty: Arteaga, Michelle MarieParty: Flores-Diaz, Armando |
|
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: BTB Financial Inc. Party: BTB Financial Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.