Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nickel, Robert Allan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nickel, Ann Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 362nd Judicial District Court with Barnes, Margaret presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House362nd Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Judges' Docket Notes from Case File | |
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Child Support info updated/added to State Disbursement Unit | |
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Nickel, Ann Michelle Party: Nickel, Ann Michelle |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Barnes, Margaret E. ) Final Decree of Divorce for Parties: Nickel, Ann Michelle for Parties: Nickel, Robert Allan Final Decree of Divorce |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer(s) and/or Response(s) to Divorce Party: Nickel, Ann Michelle to Divorce |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Original Petition for Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.