Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Flagstar Bank F. S. B., filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Lauren Christoffel, against Aucoin, Amber, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 211th Judicial District Court with Shipman, L. Dee presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryReal Property - Other Than Condemnation |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court House211th Judicial District Court |
Record/Copy Request
Date: October 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Aucoin, Adam Troy Party: Aucoin, Amber Party: Aucoin, Adam TroyParty: Aucoin, Amber |
|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Shipman, L. Dee ) Final Judgment for Parties: Aucoin, Adam Troy for Parties: Aucoin, Amber for Parties: Flagstar Bank F. S. B. Final Judgment |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Party: Flagstar Bank F. S. B. Party: Flagstar Bank F. S. B. |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address Party: Aucoin, Adam Troy Party: Aucoin, Amber Party: Aucoin, Adam TroyParty: Aucoin, Amber |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Members Civil Relief Act Affidavit Party: Aucoin, Adam Troy Party: Aucoin, Amber Party: Aucoin, Adam TroyParty: Aucoin, Amber |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit(s) (Movant's) Filed by: Flagstar Bank F. S. B. (Movant's) |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Citation mailed to Attorney Aucoin, Adam Troy Served 01/17/2013 Anticipated Server Private Process Server Anticipated Method Personal Returned 01/22/2013 Aucoin, Amber Served 01/16/2013 Anticipated Server Private Process Server Anticipated Method Personal Returned 01/22/2013 mailed to Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.