Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by District Attorney, against Snell, Richard Earl, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 211th Judicial District Court with Shipman, L. Dee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShipman, L. Dee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi - Bond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House211th Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Shipman, L. Dee) | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Payment of NISI Costs (Occ. Code 1704.212b) Sent to Sheriff Sent to Sheriff |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Billing Statement Sent to: Carbajal, Anna Sent to: Snell, Richard Earl Sent to: Carbajal, AnnaSent to: Snell, Richard Earl |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Carbajal, Anna Party: Snell, Richard Earl Party: Carbajal, AnnaParty: Snell, Richard Earl |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Due Party: Carbajal, Anna Party: Snell, Richard Earl Party: Carbajal, AnnaParty: Snell, Richard Earl |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Bill of Costs Party: Carbajal, Anna Party: Snell, Richard Earl Party: Carbajal, AnnaParty: Snell, Richard Earl |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy of Order provided to Denton Co District Attorney and Denton Co Criminal District Clerk of Order provided to Denton Co District Attorney and Denton Co Criminal District Clerk |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Shipman, L. Dee ) Judgment for Parties: Carbajal, Anna for Parties: Snell, Richard Earl for Parties: State of Texas Judgment |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address Party: Carbajal, Anna Party: Carbajal, Anna |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.