Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by District Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 211th Judicial District Court with Isaacks, Vicki presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsaacks, Vicki Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi - Bond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House211th Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Billing Statement & Bill of Cost Sent to: Bankers Insurance Company & Bill of Cost |
|
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Bankers Insurance Company Party: Donaho, Clark Jason Party: Bankers Insurance CompanyParty: Donaho, Clark Jason |
|
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Due Party: Bankers Insurance Company Party: Bankers Insurance Company |
|
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy of Judgment provided to Denton Co District Attorney and Denton Co Criminal District Clerk of Judgment provided to Denton Co District Attorney and Denton Co Criminal District Clerk |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Isaacks, Vicki ) Judgment for Parties: Bankers Insurance Company for Parties: Donaho, Clark Jason for Parties: State of Texas Judgment |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Shipman, L. Dee) | |
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Party: Bankers Insurance Company Party: Bankers Insurance Company |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Citation by First Class Mail Donaho, Clark Jason Returned Unserved 01/11/2012 Returned 01/11/2012 unable to forward | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy of Petition provided to Denton Co District Attorney and Denton Co Criminal District Clerk of Petition provided to Denton Co District Attorney and Denton Co Criminal District Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.