Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Harden, Stacy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ruben C Deleon, against Darby, Ronald, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 158th Judicial District Court with Burgess, Steve presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryDebt/Contract: Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House158th Judicial District Court |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: May 06, 2015Notice of Dismissal
Date: March 27, 2015Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: May 07, 2015Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: December 31, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Darby, Ronald Party: DeLeon, Ruben C Party: Darby, RonaldParty: DeLeon, Ruben C |
|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Burgess, Steve ) Order of Dismissal for Parties: Darby, Ronald for Parties: Harden, Stacy Order of Dismissal |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Courts Dismissal Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Burgess, Steve) 3/24/15 | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Filed by: DeLeon, Ruben C Filed by: DeLeon, Ruben C |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Party: Darby, Ronald Party: Darby, Ronald |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Citation placed at the front for pick up Darby, Ronald Served 01/25/2013 9:05 AM Anticipated Server Private Process Server Anticipated Method Personal Actual Server Private Process Server Returned 02/28/2013 9:28 AM placed at the front for pick up |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure and Request for Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.