Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Schnurbusch, Joanne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Schnurbusch, Thomas Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 158th Judicial District Court with Burgess, Steve presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House158th Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
June 05, 2014 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Judges' Docket Notes from Case File | |
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Schnurbusch, Thomas Lynn Party: Schnurbusch, Thomas Lynn |
|
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer Filed by: Schnurbusch, Thomas Lynn Filed by: Schnurbusch, Thomas Lynn |
|
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Final Decree of Divorce for Parties: Schnurbusch, Thomas Lynn Final Decree of Divorce |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Original Petition for Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.