Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wynne, Ray O., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Wallace Bowman, against Dickson, Elizabeth L., represented by Robert E. Yates, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 16th Judicial District Court with Shipman, Sherry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryInjury/Damages - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House16th Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Bowman, Wallace Party: Yates, Robert E. Party: Bowman, WallaceParty: Yates, Robert E. |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Shipman, Sherry ) Agreed Order of Dismissal for Parties: Dickson, Elizabeth L. Agreed Order of Dismissal |
|
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Document(s) | |
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Party: Dickson, Elizabeth L. Party: Dickson, Elizabeth L. |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Citation placed at front for p/u Dickson, Elizabeth L. Served 01/02/2013 12:15 PM Anticipated Method Personal Returned 01/04/2013 12:47 PM placed at front for p/u |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition and Requests for Discovery and Requests for Discovery |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.