Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzales, Roberto, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Burkott, Brittany Mikela Gonzales, Brittany Mikela, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 16th Judicial District Court with Shipman, Sherry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce Without Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House16th Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Judges' Docket Notes from Case File | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Bailey, Jonathan ) Final Decree of Divorce for Parties: Burkott, Brittany Mikela Final Decree of Divorce |
|
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Final Decree sent to Party: Burkott, Brittany Mikela Party: Burkott, Brittany Mikela |
|
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service or Citation Party: Burkott, Brittany Mikela Party: Burkott, Brittany Mikela |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Original Petition for Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.