Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzalez, Laura, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jason M Berent, against Wells Fargo Financial, Inc., Wells Fargo Financial Texas Inc, Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, Llc, Wells Fargo & Company, Poulos Realty Group, Carrollton, Llc, (total of 15) See All represented by Maryann Sarris Brousseau, Matthew G. Naftis, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Robison, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobison, Douglas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryInjury/Damages - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Judges' Docket Notes from Case File | |
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
June 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Berent, Jason M Party: Naftis, Matthew G. Party: Poulos Automotive Group Inc Party: Poulos Automotive Group Irving, Inc. Party: Poulos Automotive, Inc. Party: Poulos Enterprises, LLC Party: Poulos Family Management, LLC Party: Poulos Family, LP Party: Poulos Realty Group I, L.P. Party: Poulos Realty Group Irving, L.P. Party: Poulos Realty Group Lewisville, LP Party: Poulos Realty Group, Carrollton, LLC Party: Wells Fargo & Company Party: Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC Party: Wells Fargo Financial Texas Inc Party: Wells Fargo Financial, Inc. Party: Berent, Jason MParty: Naftis, Matthew G.Party: Poulos Automotive Group IncParty: Poulos Automotive Group Irving, Inc.Party: Poulos Automotive, Inc.Party: Poulos Enterprises, LLCParty: Poulos Family Management, LLCParty: Poulos Family, LPParty: Poulos Realty Group I, L.P.Party: Poulos Realty Group Irving, L.P.Party: Poulos Realty Group Lewisville, LPParty: Poulos Realty Group, Carrollton, LLCParty: Wells Fargo & CompanyParty: Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLCParty: Wells Fargo Financial Texas IncParty: Wells Fargo Financial, Inc. |
|
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Order of Dismissal for Parties: Gonzalez, Laura for Parties: Poulos Automotive Group Inc for Parties: Poulos Automotive Group Irving, Inc. for Parties: Poulos Automotive Group Lewisville, Inc. for Parties: Poulos Automotive, Inc. for Parties: Poulos Enterprises, LLC for Parties: Poulos Family Management, LLC for Parties: Poulos Family, LP for Parties: Poulos Realty Group I, L.P. for Parties: Poulos Realty Group Irving, L.P. for Parties: Poulos Realty Group Lewisville, LP for Parties: Poulos Realty Group, Carrollton, LLC for Parties: Wells Fargo & Company for Parties: Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC for Parties: Wells Fargo Financial Texas Inc for Parties: Wells Fargo Financial, Inc. Order of Dismissal |
|
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Courts Dismissal Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Douglas) 30 EXTENSION FROM LAST DWOP HEARING on 5-17-13. 30 EXTENSION FROM LAST DWOP HEARING on 5-17-13. |
|
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss - No Final Order to Dismiss - No Final Order |
|
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Courts Dismissal Hearing Reset CANCELED Courts Dismissal Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Douglas) Reset |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Non Jury Trial Announced Settled - Disposition order required in 30 days CANCELED Non Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Douglas) Announced Settled - Disposition order required in 30 days Docket Call on 3-15-13 at 8:45 a.m. |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter from Jason M. Berent from Jason M. Berent |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss - No Final Order to Dismiss - No Final Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.