Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Citibank, N.A. ...2007-Hf2 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-Hf2 ...Agreement Dated As Of July 1, 2007 Mastr Adjustable Rate Mortgages Trust..., Citibank, N.A.  ...2007-Hf2 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-Hf2  ...Agreement Dated As Of July 1, 2007 Mastr Adjustable Rate Mortgages Trust..., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Emily Stroope, John M Lynch, L. Keller Mackie, against Kaminski, Bruce, Kaminski, Kirsten, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Robison, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobison, Douglas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryContract: Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: February 06, 2012Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: February 02, 2012Home Equity Loan Foreclosure Application
Date: December 30, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Kaminski, Bruce Party: Kaminski, Kirsten Party: Mackie, L. Keller Party: Kaminski, BruceParty: Kaminski, KirstenParty: Mackie, L. Keller |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Order of Non-Suit for Parties: Kaminski, Bruce for Parties: Kaminski, Kirsten Order of Non-Suit |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Judges' Docket Notes from Case File | |
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Party: Citibank, N.A. Without Prejudice |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Home Equity Loan Foreclosure Application Filed by:: Citibank, N.A. Filed by:: Citibank, N.A. |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.