Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hickory Creek Plaza, Llc, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Carolyn J. Chinn Maly, David J. Kaplan, against Denton Central Appraisal District, represented by Braden W. Metcalf, Peter G. Smith, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Robison, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobison, Douglas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategoryReal Property - Other Than Condemnation |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: November 27, 2012Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: December 28, 2011Defendant's Original Answer
Date: January 23, 2012Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: November 29, 2012Record/Copy Request
Date: October 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Judges' Docket Notes from Case File | |
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Kaplan, David J. Party: Smith, Peter G. Party: Kaplan, David J.Party: Smith, Peter G. |
|
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Agreed Judgment for Parties: Denton Central Appraisal District Agreed Judgment |
|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Courts Dismissal Hearing Announced Settled - Disposition order required in 30 days CANCELED Courts Dismissal Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Douglas) Announced Settled - Disposition order required in 30 days |
|
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting Mailed to: Smith, Peter G. Mailed to: Smith, Peter G. |
|
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting Mailed to: Kaplan, David J. Mailed to: Kaplan, David J. |
|
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting Mailed to Carolyn Chinn Mailed to Carolyn Chinn |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Party: Denton Central Appraisal District Party: Denton Central Appraisal District |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.