Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by District Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 367th Judicial District Court with Barnes, Margaret E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarnes, Margaret E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi - Bond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House367th Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing Case has been disposed CANCELED Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Barnes, Margaret E.) Case has been disposed set by P. Brooks 2-9-12 |
|
July 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Billing Statement & Bill of Cost Sent to: Carranza, Oscar Garza & Bill of Cost |
|
July 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Carranza, Oscar Garza Party: Carranza, Oscar Garza |
|
July 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Due Party: Carranza, Oscar Garza Party: Carranza, Oscar Garza |
|
July 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy of Judgment provided to Denton Co District Attorney and Denton Co Criminal District Clerk of Judgment provided to Denton Co District Attorney and Denton Co Criminal District Clerk |
|
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Barnes, Margaret E. ) Judgment for Parties: Carranza, Oscar Garza for Parties: State of Texas Judgment |
|
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Citation Carranza, Oscar Garza Unserved | |
June 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Citation Made by: District Attorney (JN) Citation |
|
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note Do not issue citation requested on 05/30- citation already served Do not issue citation requested on 05/30- citation already served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.