Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Willingham, Mitchell R., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 367th Judicial District Court with Barnes, Margaret E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarnes, Margaret E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House367th Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from: Julia Henry Julia Henry |
|
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Order In Suit To Modify Parent-Child Relationship for Parties: Willingham, Amy E. for Parties: Willingham, Mitchell R. Order In Suit To Modify Parent-Child Relationship |
|
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Willingham, Amy E. Party: Willingham, Amy E. |
|
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judicial Docket Entry 05.30.2014- Signed Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship. DMR 05.30.2014- Signed Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship. DMR |
|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time CANCELED Temporary Orders Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Barnes, Margaret E.) Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time Reset via Erica with Jeffrey Stewart 4/16/14. |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Appearance of Counsel Entry of Appearance Party: Willingham, Mitchell R. Party 2: Stewart, Jeffrey A Entry of Appearance |
|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Hearing Reset CANCELED Temporary Restraining Order Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Barnes, Margaret E.) Reset Set in person by Heather Kraft with Criss & Kraft 4/8/14. |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Temporary Restraining Order on Amy E. Willingham Party: Willingham, Amy E. Temporary Restraining Order on Amy E. Willingham |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation on Amy E. Willingham Party: Willingham, Amy E. Citation on Amy E. Willingham |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.