Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pnc Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brendetta A Scott, Dominique Varner, Kristen Bates, Pascal Arteaga, Patrick Mccarren, (total of 5) See All against Devore, Ann F., in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 362nd Judicial District Court with McFarling, Bruce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcFarling, Bruce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryContract: Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House362nd Judicial District Court |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: February 23, 2012Notice of Home Equity Foreclosure application for
Date: January 03, 2012Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: February 27, 2012Application for Foreclosure
Date: December 29, 2011Letter
Date: February 22, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
August 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Devore, Ann F. Party: Devore, Ann F. |
|
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: McFarling, Bruce ) Order to Proceed With Notice of Foreclosure Sale and Foreclosure Sale for Parties: Devore, Ann F. for Parties: PNC Bank, National Association Order to Proceed With Notice of Foreclosure Sale and Foreclosure Sale |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letter frm Pascal Arteaga frm Pascal Arteaga |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Party: PNC Bank, National Association Party: PNC Bank, National Association |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address Party: Devore, Ann F. Party: Devore, Ann F. |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Members Civil Relief Act Affidavit Party: Devore, Ann F. Party: Devore, Ann F. |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Home Equity Foreclosure application for Party: Devore, Ann F. Party: Devore, Ann F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.