Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tirrell, Rebecca, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Terry, Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 211th Judicial District Court with Barnes, Margaret presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarnes, Margaret Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryDivorce Without Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House211th Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Final Decree sent to Party: Terry, Jeffrey Party: Terry, Jeffrey |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Barnes, Margaret E. ) Final Decree of Divorce for Parties: Terry, Jeffrey for Parties: Tirrell, Rebecca Final Decree of Divorce |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service or Citation Party: Terry, Jeffrey Party: Terry, Jeffrey |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Original Petition for Divorce filed by Rebecca Tirrell filed by Rebecca Tirrell |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.