Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Plaintiff Castle Hills Development Corporation, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Don Colleluori, against Ahmeti, Flamur, represented by Gretchen A. Benolken, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 12/29/2011 with Isaacks, Vicki presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsaacks, Vicki Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
|
Filing Court House12/29/2011 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Isaacks, Vicki ) Agreed Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice for Parties: Ahmeti, Flamur for Parties: Plaintiff Castle Hills Development Corporation Agreed Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Document(s) (Agreement letter from Gretchen A. Benolken) (Agreement letter from Gretchen A. Benolken) |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Document(s) | |
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Party: Ahmeti, Flamur Party: Ahmeti, Flamur |
|
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Acceptance of Service Party: Ahmeti, Flamur of Acceptance of Service |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Original Petition/Application for Declaratory Judgment and Judicial Foreclosure Filing Party: Plaintiff Castle Hills Development Corporation for Declaratory Judgment and Judicial Foreclosure |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Citation Placed at front counter for pick-up Ahmeti, Flamur Unserved Placed at front counter for pick-up |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.